CT HB06172 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To expand eligibility for the state-funded portion of the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly and reduce participant costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Reducing Participant Costs And Expanding Eligibility For The Connecticut Home-care Program For The Elderly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-07HouseFile Number 23
2019-03-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 30
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Aging

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback