CT HB06217 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - Public Hearing 03/14
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - Public Hearing 03/14
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage private investment in the state's transportation infrastructure through the establishment of a competitive sealed proposals procurement process under which state agencies may solicit proposals and enter into contracts with the private sector for design-build-finance-operate-maintain services or design-build-operate-maintain services.
Title
An Act Encouraging Private Investment In The Transportation Infrastructure Of The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-02 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |