CT HB06285 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - File Number 95
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - File Number 95
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To recognize Robert Nett, a Medal of Honor recipient and past member of the Connecticut National Guard, by renaming Camp Niantic in his honor.
Title
An Act Renaming The State Military Training Facility In Niantic As Camp Nett.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | File Number 95 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 97 |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2017-02-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |