CT HB06353 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - File Number 755
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - File Number 755
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To preserve the Stratford horseshoe crab breeding grounds for uses such as pharmaceutical development.
Title
An Act Designating The Shoreline Of The Town Of Stratford As A "no Kill Or Harvest Zone" For Horseshoe Crabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 126 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | File Number 755 |
2017-05-12 | House | Senate Calendar Number 448 |
2017-05-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-10 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6296 |
2017-03-09 | House | File Number 24 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Calendar Number 52 |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/08 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-01 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |