CT HB06366 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - File Number 758
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - File Number 758
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Establishment Of The Department Of Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Sen. Donald Williams [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] |
Rep. Larry Butler [D] | Sen. Dante Bartolomeo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | File Number 758 |
2013-05-07 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-07 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 308 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 197 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |