CT HB06403 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-27 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-27 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the prohibition on utility termination to households that include children less than twenty-four months old.
Title
An Act Concerning Utility Termination For Households With A Child Not More Than Twenty-four Months Old.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-27 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-24 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 486 | |
2011-04-07 | House Calendar Number 285 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |