CT HB06427 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Governor to determine the structure of the militia units and authorize the Adjutant General to issue bylaws, regulations, orders and circulars for the militia.
Title
An Act Concerning The Organizational Structure And Bylaws Of The Militia Units.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R] |
Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. John Hennessy [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 457 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | House | Public Act 21-158 |
2021-06-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 372 |
2021-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | File Number 226 |
2021-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 187 |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |