CT HB06546 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate greater utilization of home health care services in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Home Health Care Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-29 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-28 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-13 | File Number 522 | |
2011-04-13 | House Calendar Number 315 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-28 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-07 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |
2011-03-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |