CT HB06546 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require a study of the prevalence of the hepatitis C virus in correctional institutions and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Study Of The Prevalence Of The Hepatitis C Virus In Correctional Institutions And Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-21HouseFile Number 84
2019-03-21HouseHouse Calendar Number 74
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-21HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-05HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback