CT HB06615 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require (1) water companies to provide drinking water to consumers in the event of a water main break or loss of system pressure; (2) small community water systems to prepare capacity implementation plans; and (3) bottlers to test approved water sources for unregulated contaminants and report such results to the department.
Title
An Act Concerning Safe Drinking Water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-30 | House | No New File by Committee on Environment |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Environment |
2021-04-14 | House | File Number 439 |
2021-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 331 |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |