CT HB06622 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To limit the circumstances in which a health carrier may remove a prescription drug from a drug formulary or list of covered drugs, or move a prescription drug to a different cost-sharing tier, during a plan year.
Title
An Act Concerning Prescription Drug Formularies And Lists Of Covered Drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 336 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 AS AMENDED (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 AS AMENDED (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Act 21-96 |
2021-06-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-27 | House | File Number 753 |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 513 |
2021-05-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9290 |
2021-04-08 | House | File Number 348 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 264 |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |