CT HB06642 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To conduct a study of access to municipal-owned beaches and parks adjacent to marine or tidal waters.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Access To Municipal-owned Beaches And Parks Adjacent To Marine Or Tidal Waters.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. John Hennessy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | File Number 531 |
2021-04-20 | House | House Calendar Number 384 |
2021-04-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |