CT HB06671 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Funding For School Lunches And A Center For Sustainable Aviation, Special Education Funding, Certain Bottle Deposits, Certain State Positions And The Posting Of State Job Openings And Bond Covenant Restrictions And The Budget Reserve Fund.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For School Lunches And A Center For Sustainable Aviation, Special Education Funding, Certain Bottle Deposits, Certain State Positions And The Posting Of State Job Openings And Bond Covenant Restrictions And The Budget Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 8 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 8 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-02-21 | House | Public Act 23-1 |
2023-02-14 | House | Signed by Governor in Original |
2023-02-09 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2023-02-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | House Passed |
2023-02-09 | House | Rules Suspended |
2023-02-09 | House | Emergency Certification |