CT HB06717 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - File Number 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - File Number 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require (1) the Department of Public Health to develop certain guidelines and best practices for school food service employees, and (2) local and regional boards of education to provide such guidelines and best practices to school food service employees annually.
Title
An Act Concerning Guidelines And Best Practices For School Food Service Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | File Number 41 |
2023-03-09 | House | House Calendar Number 52 |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |