CT HB06765 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - File Number 881
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - File Number 881
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To update and strengthen training and educational requirements for interpreters involved in communications with deaf and hard of hearing persons.
Title
An Act Concerning Interpreter Qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 178 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | File Number 881 |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 574 |
2015-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6794 |
2015-05-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Education |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2015-04-02 | House | File Number 411 |
2015-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 269 |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |