CT HB06767 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - Senate Calendar Number 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - Senate Calendar Number 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make certain changes to the statutes concerning the approval and authorization of private occupational schools.
Title
An Act Concerning Private Occupational Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 236 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 608 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | File Number 908 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-27 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6002 |
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 171 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 118 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |