CT HB06914 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To institute a minimum workweek of thirty hours for individuals who perform janitorial or building maintenance services.
Title
An Act Concerning A Minimum Workweek For Persons Performing Janitorial Or Building Maintenance Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | House | File Number 223 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 175 |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2017-03-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |