CT HB06924 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - File Number 692
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - File Number 692
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize tobacco product manufacturers and their transferees to assign funds in qualified escrow funds to the state and to require nonparticipating tobacco product manufacturers to appoint an agent in this state for service of process.
Title
An Act Concerning The Assignment Of Funds In Qualified Escrow Funds And The Appointment Of An Agent By Certain Tobacco Product Manufacturers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | File Number 692 |
2023-05-03 | House | House Calendar Number 464 |
2023-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/23 5:00 PM |
2023-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-30 | House | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |