CT HB06957 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require installation of certain accessibility equipment to assist persons with disabilities in newly constructed or renovated state-owned buildings and buildings leased to the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Accessibility Equipment To Assist Persons With Disabilities In Certain State Buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 479
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 304
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-12HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback