CT HB06997 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Education to (1) publish information concerning services and resources available to victims of domestic violence on the Internet web site of the Department of Education; and (2) require the provision of such information to students, parents and guardians who express safety concerns due to domestic violence and parents and guardians who authorize the transfer of education records to another school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring The Provision Of Information Concerning Domestic Violence Services And Resources To Students, Parents And Guardians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-146
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 809
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 402
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7023
2019-04-09HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseNo New File by Committee on Education
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-02HouseReferred by House to Committee on Education
2019-03-25HouseFile Number 119
2019-03-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 97
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children
2019-03-05HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-21HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06997&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R03-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00146-R00HB-06997-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R00KID-CV13-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R00KID-CV29-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R00KID-CV53-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06997-R00ED-CV58-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00044-R00HB06997-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00390-R00HB06997-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback