CT HB07061 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - File Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow surplus vehicles from the state motor pool to be provided to veterans' charitable organizations for donation to certain disabled combat veterans with a demonstrated need for financial assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Offering Of Certain Motor Vehicles From The State Motor Pool To Veterans' Charitable Organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseFile Number 25
2019-03-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 32
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback