CT HB07148 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 884
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 884
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June Thirtieth, 2021, And Making Appropriations Therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | File Number 884 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Calendar Number 597 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM |
2019-05-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |