CT HB07155 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Senate Calendar Number 447
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Senate Calendar Number 447
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Office of Early Childhood to develop a proposed early childhood educator compensation schedule for early childhood educators that will help ensure the retention and recruitment of qualified educators, secure a standard of living that meets such educators' needs, and reflect the true costs associated with quality standards for early childhood care and education programs.
Title
An Act Requiring The Office Of Early Childhood To Develop A Proposed Early Childhood Educator Compensation Schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 134 (Y: 95 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Senate Calendar Number 447 |
2017-05-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-11 | House | File Number 506 |
2017-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 346 |
2017-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |