CT HB07159 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To create the Connecticut State Seal of Biliteracy which is to be affixed to the high school diploma of those students who have achieved a high level of proficiency in English and one or more foreign languages.
Title
An Act Concerning Connecticut's Seal Of Biliteracy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 230 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 40 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 40 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-05-30 | House | Public Act 17-29 |
2017-05-25 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Senate Calendar Number 257 |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | House Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | File Number 233 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 184 |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |