CT HB07167 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - File Number 803
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - File Number 803
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the licensure of behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts.
Title
An Act Concerning Behavior Analysts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | File Number 803 |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 540 |
2017-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7786 |
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-06 | House | File Number 457 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 318 |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |