CT HB07178 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit veterans suffering from service-connected post-traumatic stress disorder to apply for and receive a windshield placard allowing such veterans to park in spaces reserved for persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning Windshield Placards For Certain Veterans With Post-traumatic Stress Disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Transportation |
2017-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |