CT HB07222 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health concerning various revisions to the public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Various Revisions To The Public Health Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 318 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 318 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 318 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-19 | House | Public Act 17-146 |
2017-06-06 | House | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 587 |
2017-06-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8493 |
2017-06-03 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8433 |
2017-06-03 | House | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 8433 |
2017-04-13 | House | File Number 594 |
2017-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 396 |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |