CT HB07288 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 414
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 414
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To promote fairness in snow removal and ice control services contracts.
Title
An Act Concerning Snow Removal And Ice Control Services Contracts.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] |
Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 59 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 414 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 495 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 322 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |