CT HB07303 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement various recommendations by the Department of Public Health regarding dental practitioners.
Title
An Act Concerning Dental Practitioners.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Quentin Williams [D] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] |
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Rep. Tom Arnone [D] | Rep. Philip Young [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 297 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 317 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 317 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public Act 19-72 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 678 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10428 |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 696 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 432 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |