CT HB07321 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - File Number 766
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - File Number 766
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a credit revenue bond program.
Title
An Act Establishing A Credit Revenue Bond Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | File Number 766 |
2017-05-15 | House | House Calendar Number 512 |
2017-05-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/17 10:00 AM |
2017-04-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-21 | House | Public Hearing 04/25 |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |