CT HB07366 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a state income tax credit for purchasers of certain energy-efficient homes.
Title
An Act Concerning Incentives For Energy-efficient Construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 703 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 439 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |