CT HB07371 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - File Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - File Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To regulate the retail sale of cannabis.
Title
An Act Concerning The Retail Sale Of Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 585 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 358 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |