CT SB00005 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enhance political contribution disclosure laws, to increase certain contribution limits, to streamline filing requirements, to clarify provisions re status on enrollment lists at time of nomination for certain offices and to make technical changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Changes To Campaign Finance Laws And Other Election Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | File Number 595 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 434 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Vote to Reconsider |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |