CT SB00007 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - File Number 562
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - File Number 562
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To designate Calf Pasture Beach in Norwalk as a wildlife refuge but permit fishing in such refuge.
Title
An Act Concerning Water Fowl Hunting At Calf Pasture Beach In Norwalk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | File Number 562 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 274 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |