CT SB00011 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - House Calendar Number 434
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - House Calendar Number 434
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create more fairness in banking.
Title
An Act Requiring Notice Of The Reordering Of Banking Transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 434 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | File Number 240 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 199 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |