CT SB00011 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Making Adjustments To State Revenue And Concerning Captive Insurance Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 22 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 22 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 608 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 436 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/30 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |