CT SB00017 | 2011 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To expand or require health insurance coverage for ostomy-related supplies, prosthetic devices, hearing aids for children, wigs for patients who suffer hair loss due to certain medical conditions, and bone marrow testing; to prohibit the imposition of a coinsurance, copayment, deductible or other out-of-pocket expense for any additional colonoscopy ordered in a policy year by a physician for an insured; to promote health behavior wellness, maintenance or improvement program participation by requiring insurers to offer such programs, and to require an incentive or reward for such participation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Wellness Programs And Expansion Of Health Insurance Coverage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 Motion Failed JF
2011-01-28 Public Hearing 02/03
2011-01-19 Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2011-01-18 Drafted by Committee
2011-01-14 Vote to Draft
2011-01-05 Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback