CT SB00072 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish liability for running bamboo that spreads beyond the boundaries of a property owner and to establish a duty to contain running bamboo that is growing in such a location that it could spread beyond the boundaries of a property owner.
Title
An Act Concerning Liability For The Growing Of Running Bamboo.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 309 (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 14-100 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 508 |
2014-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 367 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 257 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |