CT SB00073 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Children
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Children
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study children's safety within the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Children |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-22 | Senate | File Number 119 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 136 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |