CT SB00086 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Homelessness Response System to provide increased funding for the coordinated access networks and the United Way of Connecticut 2-1-1 Infoline program for housing resources.
Title
An Act Establishing The Homelessness Response System To Allocate Resources For The Homeless And To Prevent Homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |