CT SB00094 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify certain protections under state housing law for persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Equal Treatment Of Renters With Mental Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 230 (Y: 123 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 201 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 201 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-11 | Public Act 12-41 | |
2012-05-04 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-04 | House Passed | |
2012-04-28 | House Calendar Number 457 | |
2012-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-26 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Passed | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-02 | File Number 192 | |
2012-04-02 | Senate Calendar Number 184 | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-23 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |