CT SB00096 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To determine how to expand access to primary care in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Working Group To Enhance Physician Recruitment In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateNo Action
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-21SenateFile Number 99
2019-03-21SenateSenate Calendar Number 66
2019-03-21SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-21SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-05SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-20SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-14SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback