CT SB00098 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit insurers from imposing a deductible for a procedure that is initially undertaken as a screening colonoscopy or a screening sigmoidoscopy.
Title
An Act Concerning Deductibles For Screening Colonoscopies And Screening Sigmoidoscopies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 189 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-190 | |
2012-05-09 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-28 | House Calendar Number 458 | |
2012-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-26 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 4074 | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3995 | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-17 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-08 | File Number 18 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Calendar Number 60 | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-02-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-02-28 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |