CT SB00130 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a land value taxation pilot program.
Title
An Act Concerning Land Value Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 439 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 281 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-16 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2011-01-28 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |