CT SB00135 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - File Number 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - File Number 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that neither the Commissioner of Consumer Protection nor the Department of Consumer Protection may charge certain individuals a license, permit, certification or registration fee in an amount that is greater than one hundred dollars per license, certification, permit or registration year.
Title
An Act Establishing A Maximum Charge For Certain Occupational Licenses, Certifications, Permits And Registrations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | File Number 71 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 71 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |