CT SB00137 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require any contractor that enters into a contract for a public utility project to offer apprenticeship or preapprenticeship training programs and pay prevailing wage rates.
Title
An Act Concerning Gas, Electric, Sewer And Water Delivery Work.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 303 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 198 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |