CT SB00162 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To help spouses of nursing home residents to live independently longer in the community.
Title
An Act Concerning A Community Spouse's Allowable Assets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2016-03-23 | Senate | File Number 160 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 151 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |