CT SB00178 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 320
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 320
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the education and training of barbers, hairdressers and cosmeticians to include working with textured hair.
Title
An Act Requiring The Education And Training Of Barbers, Hairdressers And Cosmeticians To Include Working With Textured Hair.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. Fred Gee [D] | Rep. Emmanuel Sanchez [D] |
Rep. James Sanchez [D] | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 320 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | File Number 10 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 29 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |