CT SB00195 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify that persons eligible to receive Medicaid-funded services are not eligible to receive services under the Connecticut home-care program for persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Home-care Program For Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |