CT SB00205 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-06 - House Calendar Number 534
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-06 - House Calendar Number 534
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To alter when and how an insurer or health care center may rescind, cancel or limit health insurance coverage.
Title
An Act Concerning Rescission, Cancellation And Limitation Of Health Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 207 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 534 |
2018-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | File Number 99 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 83 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |